+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- CDHT - Majority; do pass with amendment(s).
- CDHT - Executive action taken by committee.
- Public hearing, executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Development, and Housing & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM.
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- CL - Majority; do pass.
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM.
On January 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM.
On January 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor.
On December 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Prefiled for introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor