+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date 7/1/2014.
- Governor signed.
- Chapter 66, 2014 Laws.
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor.
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 8, 2014 in the House:
- President signed.
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 66; nays, 31; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Committee amendment not adopted.
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- GOE - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 1:30 PM.
- GOE - Majority; do pass with amendment(s).
- Minority; do not pass.
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 10:00 AM.
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 2.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- 1st substitute bill not substituted.
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- GOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM.
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM.
On January 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Governmental Operations.
On December 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Prefiled for introduction.
+ − Amendments (4)
5964 AMS ROAC BROS 035 (AMD 527 )
5964 AMS ROAC BROS 035 (AMD 527 )
5964 AMS FAIN BROS 035
ADOPTED 02/18/2014
5964-S AMS ROAC BROS 030
OUT OF ORDER 02/18/2014
5964.E AMH GOE H4379.1
NOT ADOPTED 03/07/2014
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor