+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Judiciary (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (LAW 18). (View 1st Substitute)
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Law & Justice. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor