+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- HSRR - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. (View Original Bill)