+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On January 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Moved to Rules White Sheet.
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- Minority; without recommendation.
- NRP - Majority; do pass.
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM.
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM.
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Natural Resources & Parks.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor