+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 28, 2019 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- ENVI - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 9, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Environment & Energy.
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- 1st substitute bill substituted (WM 19). (View 1st Substitute)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:20 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- ENET - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor