+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date 6/12/2014.
- Chapter 31, 2014 Laws.
- Governor signed.
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor.
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- President signed.
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM.
- HCW - Executive action taken by committee.
- HCW - Majority; do pass.
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM.
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 0.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On January 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- HLTH - Majority; do pass.
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM.
On January 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM.
On January 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Health Care.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor