+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 28, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 27, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules.
On June 23, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on third reading.
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM.
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Local Government (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Notice to reconsider withdrawn.
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Notice given to reconsider vote on third reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 33; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 2.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation.
- Minority; do not pass.
- LAW - Majority; do pass.
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 9:00 AM.
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM.
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Law & Justice.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor