+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Effective date 7/28/2019.
- Chapter 57, 2019 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
- HSEL - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Human Services & Early Learning.
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading consent calendar.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- HSRR - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 8:30 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor