+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Transportation (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (TRAN 14).
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
On January 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Transportation.
+ − Amendment
5886-S AMS KING MCCA 049
ADOPTED 02/12/2014
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor