+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 31, 2022 in the House:
- Effective date 6/9/2022.
- Chapter 291, 2022 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On March 11, 2022 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 29; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Senate concurred in House amendments.
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
On February 26, 2022 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 21, 2022 in the House:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Children, Youth & Families at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
- CYF - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Children, Youth & Families at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 12, 2022 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Children, Youth & Families.
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 28; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (LAW 22). (View 1st Substitute)
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 9:30 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Law & Justice. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor