+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- Effective date 6/9/2016.
- Chapter 120, 2016 Laws.
- Governor signed.
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor.
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- President signed.
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 85; nays, 11; absent, 0; excused, 2.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
- Minority; without recommendation.
- Minority; do not pass.
- APP - Majority; do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
On February 27, 2016 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Appropriations (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on third reading by Rules Committee.
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 28, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Appropriations (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- WM - Majority; do pass.
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing, executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Ways & Means.
+ − Amendment
5873 AMS KOHL CUTL 055
ADOPTED 03/06/2015
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor