+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Judiciary (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 32; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 4. (View 1st Engrossed) (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- 2nd substitute bill substituted (WM 17). (View 2nd Substitute)
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 2nd Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Law & Justice. (View Original Bill)