+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 28, 2013 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
- APPG - Majority; do pass with amendment(s) by Judiciary.
- APPG - Executive action taken by committee.
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government & Information Technology at 1:30 PM.
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government.
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM.
- JUDI - Executive action taken by committee.
- JUDI - Majority; do pass with amendment(s).
- Minority; do not pass.
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM.
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Judiciary (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- WM - Majority; do pass.
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Ways & Means.
+ − Amendments (2)
5860 AMS PADD JONE 001
ADOPTED 03/08/2013
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor