+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration; referred to Ways & Means.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 28, 2019 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Capital Budget.
On March 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (WM 19). (View 1st Substitute)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 40; nays, 5; absent, 1; excused, 3. (View 1st Engrossed) (View Roll Calls)
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Ways & Means. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (38)
Type:
Primary Sponsor