+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:20 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- SGTE - Majority; without recommendation. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. (View Original Bill)