+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Effective date 7/23/2017.
- Chapter 229, 2017 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Senate concurred in House amendments.
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Committee amendment(s) adopted with no other amendments.
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- COG - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View 1st Engrossed) (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- CLS - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
- First reading, referred to Commerce, Labor & Sports. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor