+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On January 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On January 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- Minority; do not pass.
- WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Ways & Means.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor