+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration; referred to Ways & Means.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 28, 2019 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Appropriations.
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- WM - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Ways & Means. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor