+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Effective date 7/28/2013.
- Chapter 315, 2013 Laws.
- Governor signed.
On April 27, 2013 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor.
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
- President signed.
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3.
- Senate concurred in House amendments.
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- Committee amendment not adopted.
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 9:00 AM.
- GOE - Majority; do pass with amendment(s).
- GOE - Executive action taken by committee.
- Minority; do not pass.
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 1:30 PM.
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 8:30 AM.
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Made eligible to be placed on second reading.
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- HSC - Majority; do pass.
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 10:00 AM.
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections.
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 10:00 AM.
+ − Amendments (2)
5810 AMH GOE H2125.2
NOT ADOPTED 04/11/2013
5810 AMH HUNS H2382.1
ADOPTED 04/11/2013
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor