+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 28, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM.
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Technology & Economic Development (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st substitute bill substituted (GOS 15).
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- GOS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 5:30 PM.
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM.
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Government Operations & Security.
+ − Amendment
5804-S AMS LIIA S2016.2
ADOPTED 03/06/2015
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor