+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
- WM - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- AWTE - Majority; without recommendation. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Trade & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Trade & Economic Development. (View Original Bill)