+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Rules White Sheet.
On April 23, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On April 14, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- FIN - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Finance (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 5. (View 1st Engrossed) (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (CLS 17). (View 1st Substitute)
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- CLS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 5:45 PM. (Committee Materials)
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Commerce, Labor & Sports. (View Original Bill)