+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Made eligible to be placed on second reading.
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- LBRC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:05 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor