+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (45)
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Effective date 6/7/2018*.
- Chapter 67, 2018 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- President signed.
- Passed final passage; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Senate concurred in House amendments.
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Committee amendment not adopted.
- Committee amendment(s) adopted as amended.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- TR - Majority; do pass with amendment(s) along with amendment(s) by State Government, Elections & Information Technology. (Majority Report)
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- SEIT - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Referred to Transportation.
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Public hearing and executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- First reading, referred to State Government, Elections & Information Technology (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On February 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (SGTE 18). (View 1st Substitute)
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- TRAN - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. On motion, referred to Transportation.
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- SGTE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Due to Senate committee reorganization, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to State Government. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor