+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 28, 2019 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Human Services & Early Learning.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- 1st substitute bill substituted (HSRR 19). (View 1st Substitute)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 29; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View Roll Calls)
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- HSRR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor