+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- HEWD - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development. (View Original Bill)