+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Effective date 6/7/2018.
- Chapter 300, 2018 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 33; nays, 16; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Senate concurred in House amendments.
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 66; nays, 32; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Held on second reading.
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
- HCW - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 32; nays, 16; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
- HLTC - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Due to Senate committee reorganization, referred to Health & Long Term Care.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Health Care. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor