+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On July 20, 2017 in the House:
- Returned to Senate Rules 3.
On June 28, 2017 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 26; nays, 21; absent, 1; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Placed on third reading by Rules Committee.
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
- Returned to Senate Rules 3.
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on third reading by Rules Committee.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 23, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On April 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Rules White Sheet.
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 28; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 3. (View 1st Engrossed) (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- AWTE - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Trade & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Trade & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Trade & Economic Development. (View Original Bill)