+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 28, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
- Minority; do not pass.
- SG - Majority; do pass with amendment(s).
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government at 8:00 AM.
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government at 8:00 AM.
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to State Government (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 41; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 0.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (WM 15).
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation.
- WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Ways & Means.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor