+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Effective date 7/28/2013.
- Chapter 57, 2013 Laws.
- Governor signed.
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor.
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- President signed.
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 90; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 5.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Higher Education at 9:00 AM.
- HE - Executive action taken by committee.
- HE - Majority; do pass.
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Higher Education at 8:00 AM.
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Higher Education (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Made eligible to be placed on second reading.
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- HIE - Majority; do pass.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education at 1:30 PM.
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education at 1:30 PM.
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Higher Education.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor