+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Rules White Sheet.
On April 23, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Education (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st substitute bill substituted (WM 17). (View 1st Substitute)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 11:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- EDU - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor