+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
- Minority; without recommendation.
- Minority; do not pass.
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- HLTH - Majority; do pass.
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM.
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM.
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Health Care.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor