+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Due to Senate committee reorganization, referred to Health & Long Term Care.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Health Care. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor