+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
- Minority; do not pass.
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- TRED - Majority; do pass.
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Trade & Economic Development at 8:00 AM.
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Trade & Economic Development.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Warnick
Type:
Primary Sponsor