+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On January 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- Minority; without recommendation.
- Minority; do not pass.
- WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 2:00 PM.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- HSC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 5:30 PM.
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 10:00 AM.
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor