+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (42)
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Effective date 3/22/2018.
- Chapter 161, 2018 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 44; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Senate concurred in House amendments.
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Committee amendment not adopted.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Committee amendment(s) adopted with no other amendments.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- APP - Majority; do pass with amendment(s) but without amendment(s) by Health Care & Wellness. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 11:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 24, 2018 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
- HCW - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (WM 18). (View 1st Substitute)
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- HLTH - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Health Care. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor