+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Effective date 7/24/2015.
- Chapter 217, 2015 Laws.
- Governor signed.
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor.
- Speaker signed.
- President signed.
- Passed final passage; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 1.
- Senate concurred in House amendments.
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 91; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 0.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- Returned to second reading for amendment.
- House receded from amendments.
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Senate insists on its position and asks House to recede.
- House insists on its position and asks Senate to concur.
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Senate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House to recede from amendments.
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 84; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 1.
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
- ED - Majority; do pass with amendment(s).
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 10:00 AM.
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM.
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Education (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st substitute bill substituted (EDU 15).
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Made eligible to be placed on second reading.
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM.
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.
+ − Amendments (2)
5679-S AMH SANT H2749.1
ADOPTED 04/23/2015
5679-S AMH ED WARG 136
ADOPTED 04/09/2015
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor