+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (39)
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Effective date 7/28/2019.
- Chapter 466, 2019 Laws PV. (View Session Law)
- Governor partially vetoed. (View Veto Message)
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On April 27, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 31; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Senate concurred in House amendments.
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Committee amendment not adopted.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Committee amendment(s) adopted as amended.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- APP - Majority; do pass with amendment(s) but without amendment(s) by Health Care & Wellness. (Majority Report)
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- HCW - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 2nd substitute bill substituted (WM 19). (View 2nd Substitute)
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:20 PM. (Committee Materials)
- WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 2nd Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- HLTC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor