+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Effective date 7/28/2019.
- Chapter 402, 2019 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View Roll Calls)
- Senate concurred in House amendments.
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 4. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Committee recommendations adopted and the bill amended.
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
- LG - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 9, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Local Government.
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (LGOV 19). (View 1st Substitute)
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- LGOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Local Government. (View Original Bill)