+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 28, 2019 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- ITED - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Innovation, Technology & Economic Development.
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd substitute bill substituted (WM 19). (View 2nd Substitute)
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View 1st Engrossed) (View Roll Calls)
On March 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 2nd Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:20 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- ENET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. (View Original Bill)