+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- WM - Majority; without recommendation.
- Minority; without recommendation.
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
- Minority; do not pass.
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- EET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Energy and Environment & Telecommunications at 1:30 PM.
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Energy and Environment & Telecommunications at 1:30 PM.
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Energy, Environment & Telecommunications.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor