+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 28, 2013 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
- LG - Majority; do pass with amendment(s).
- LG - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:30 AM.
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM.
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Local Government (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- 1st substitute bill substituted (TRED 13).
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 33; nays, 16; absent, 0; excused, 0.
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- Minority; do not pass.
- WM - Majority; do pass TRED 13 bill proposed by Trade & Economic Development.
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation.
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- TRED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Trade & Economic Development at 5:30 PM.
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Trade & Economic Development at 8:00 AM.
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Trade & Economic Development.
+ − Amendments (2)
5656-S AMS MULL S2092.1
ADOPTED 03/11/2013
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor