+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Rules White Sheet.
On April 23, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- LG - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Local Government (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 5. (View 1st Engrossed) (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- LGOV - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Local Government. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor