+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
- And refer to Ways & Means.
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- BH - Majority; without recommendation. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care.
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. (View Original Bill)