+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Effective date 7/23/2017.
- Chapter 328, 2017 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Senate concurred in House amendments.
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 67; nays, 30; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Committee amendment(s) adopted with no other amendments.
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- FIN - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Finance.
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- LG - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Local Government (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View 1st Engrossed) (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (LGOV 17). (View 1st Substitute)
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- LGOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Local Government. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor