+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Due to Senate committee reorganization, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Natural Resources & Parks. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor