+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- HSMH - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Mental Health & Housing at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Mental Health & Housing at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Human Services, Mental Health & Housing. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor