+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Rules White Sheet.
On April 23, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Appropriations (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 25; nays, 24; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- 1st substitute bill substituted (WM 17). (View 1st Substitute)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
- First reading, referred to Ways & Means. (View Original Bill)
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor