+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On January 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. On motion, referred to Government Operations & Security.
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Made eligible to be placed on second reading.
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- Minority; without recommendation.
- Minority; do not pass.
- GOS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM.
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM.
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Government Operations & State Security.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor